EP0964425 - Apparatus for processing a work piece with a uniformly neutralised ion beam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2005 [2005/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogura, Satoshi 36-13-202, Kuji-cho 5-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1222 / JP | 02 /
Ooishi, Shotaro 24-15, Higashikanesawa-cho 2-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316-0014 / JP | 03 /
Hashimoto, Isao 15-15, Minamikoya-cho 1-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1224 / JP | 04 /
Ichimura, Satoshi Jikyo-ryo A202, 12-1, Ayukawa-cho 6-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316-0036 / JP | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [1999/50] | Application number, filing date | 99110048.8 | 21.05.1999 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | JP19980160271 | 09.06.1998 Original published format: JP 16027198 | [1999/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0964425 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0964425 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01J27/18, H01J37/08 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
H01J37/08 (EP,US);
H01J27/18 (EP,US);
H01J2237/0041 (EP,US);
H01J2237/0817 (EP,US);
H01J2237/3142 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/50] | H01J37/02 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/45] |
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Apparat zur Bearbeitung eines Werkstücks mit einem gleichmässig neutralisierten Ionenstrahl | [1999/50] | English: | Apparatus for processing a work piece with a uniformly neutralised ion beam | [1999/50] | French: | Apparaeil pour le traitement d'une cible par un faisceau d'ions uniformement neutralisé | [2000/01] |
Former [1999/50] | Appareil pour le traitment d'une cible par un faisceau d'ions uniformement neu tralisé | Examination procedure | 12.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/19] | 07.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.09.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.09.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0740327 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6,9 * the whole document * * column 4, line 42 - column 7, line 49; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US5032202 (TSAI CHIN-CHI [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,9 * column 3, lines 12-32; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0443154 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 3,8 *; | [A]US5518572 (KINOSHITA OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 3 * |