EP0962289 - Bolt driving tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adolf Würth GmbH & Co. KG Reinhold-Würth-Strasse 12-16 74653 Künzelsau / DE | [1999/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kellner, Gerd Dr.-Ing Dr. Helmut Junghans Str. 49/1 78713 Schramberg / DE | 02 /
* * * | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99110258.3 | 27.05.1999 | [1999/49] | Priority number, date | DE1998124389 | 30.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19824389 | [1999/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0962289 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0962289 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0962289 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B25C1/14 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
B25C1/14 (EP);
F15B15/226 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2001/30] |
Former [1999/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bolzenschubgerät | [1999/49] | English: | Bolt driving tool | [1999/49] | French: | Outil de scellement de chevilles | [1999/49] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 11.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) MC | 23.02.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.06.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.05.2004 | FI | 27.05.2004 | IE | 27.05.2004 | LU | 27.05.2004 | GB | 03.06.2004 | SE | 03.06.2004 | PT | 03.08.2004 | GR | 03.12.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2005/45] | CY | 27.05.2004 | |
FI | 27.05.2004 | ||
IE | 27.05.2004 | ||
LU | 27.05.2004 | ||
GB | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | CY | 27.05.2004 | |
FI | 27.05.2004 | ||
IE | 27.05.2004 | ||
LU | 27.05.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | CY | 27.05.2004 | |
FI | 27.05.2004 | ||
LU | 27.05.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | CY | 27.05.2004 | |
FI | 27.05.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | CY | 27.05.2004 | |
FI | 27.05.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | SE | 03.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1011819 (GOETZEWERKE); | [A]US3301335 (SNELLING THOMAS E); | [DA]EP0732178 (ADOLF WUERTH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | by applicant | DE8915510U | EP0732178 |