EP0961319 - Integrated flexible interconnection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wong, Kaiser H. 1128 Dahlia Way Torrance, California 90502 / US | 02 /
Mojarradi, Mohammad M. 150 N.W. Terre View Drive Apt. 1-44 Pullman, Washington 99163 / US | 03 /
Zomorrodi, Mehrdad 7621 Carmenita Lane West Hills, California 91304 / US | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99110300.3 | 27.05.1999 | [1999/48] | Priority number, date | US19980085939 | 28.05.1998 Original published format: US 85939 | US19980085763 | 28.05.1998 Original published format: US 85763 | [1999/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0961319 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0961319 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/538, H01L23/482 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
H01L23/4822 (EP);
H01L24/01 (EP);
H01L2924/01029 (EP);
H01L2924/12042 (EP);
H01L2924/14 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/14, H01L2924/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [1999/48] | H01L23/538 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/03] |
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Integrierte, flexible Verbindung | [1999/48] | English: | Integrated flexible interconnection | [1999/48] | French: | Interconnexion integrée et souple | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 28.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/21] | 05.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5452182 (KORNRUMPF WILLIAM P ET AL) [X] 1-3 * column 7, line 47 - column 9, line 47; figure 1 * [Y] 4-6; | [Y]US4086375 (LACHAPELLE JR THEODORE J ET AL) [Y] 3-6 * column 2, lines 10-12 *; | [XY]US4783695 (EICHELBERGER CHARLES W ET AL) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 57 - column 9, line 55; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3-6; | [X]US4246595 (NOYORI MASAHARU ET AL) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 36 - column 6, line 20; figures 4,5 *; | [X]US3947952 (MILLER THOMAS SAMUEL ET AL) [X] 1 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 61; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4011144 (BACHMAN ALBERT K) [A] 1 * see the whole document *; | [A]JPS62165955 ; | [Y]EP0740343 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP ;MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD (JP)) [Y] 7 * page 4, column 5, line 29 - page 5, column 7, line 25 *; | [Y]DE4226167 (SEL ALCATEL AG) [Y] 7 * page 3, line 61 - page 4, line 6 *; | [Y]EP0749157 (AT & T CORP) [Y] 7 * page 2, column 2, line 50 - page 5, column 7, line 26 *; | [Y]US5277756 (DION JOHN B) [Y] 7 * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 40 *; | [A]EP0475223 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [A] 7 * see Abstract*; | [A]EP0348972 (SHARP KK) [A] 7 * page 3, column 4, line 45 - page 4, column 5, line 27 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880109), vol. 012, no. 007, Database accession no. (E - 571), & JP62165955 A 19870722 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |