EP0964580 - Method and apparatus for production, transmission and display of television programs in commercial localities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Breeze TV GmbH Hauptstrasse 33 50259 Pulheim-Stommeln / DE | [1999/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Backhaus, Hagen, Prof. Dr. Friedensstrasse 13 42349 Wuppertal / DE | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Wulf Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | Bauer, Wulf, Dr. Bayenthalgürtel 15 50968 Köln (Marienburg) / DE | Application number, filing date | 99110328.4 | 28.05.1999 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | DE1998125394 | 10.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19825394 | [1999/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0964580 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0964580 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/18 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
H04M11/007 (EP);
H04N7/18 (EP);
H04N5/85 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, NL [2001/12] |
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung, Übertragung und Wiedergabe von Fernsehprogrammen in Geschäftsräumen | [1999/50] | English: | Method and apparatus for production, transmission and display of television programs in commercial localities | [1999/50] | French: | Méthode et appareil de production, transmission et affichage de programmes de télévision pour locaux commerciaux | [1999/50] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 03.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/23] | 08.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9410248U (PRODAC PROZESDATENTECHNIK GMBH) [A] 1,2,4,15,17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5666291 (SAGEY RICHARD ET AL) [A] 1,2,17 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 35 * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 13 * * column 3, line 45 - line 23; figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 33; figure 5 *; | [A]DE9107565U (CIS DIGITALE INFORMATIONSSYSTEME GMBH) [A] 1,17 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 5 - page 7, paragraph 5; figure . * |