EP0965511 - Axle assembly for railway vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. 53175 Bonn / DE | [1999/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gretzschel, Moritz Ludwig-Wörl-Strasse 26 81375 München / DE | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | von Kirschbaum, Albrecht Patentanwalt Postfach 1520 82102 Germering / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | von Kirschbaum, Albrecht, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bahnhofplatz 2 82102 Germering / DE | Application number, filing date | 99110344.1 | 28.05.1999 | [1999/51] | Priority number, date | DE1998123980 | 29.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19823980 | [1999/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0965511 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0965511 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0965511 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B61C9/50, B61F3/16, B61F5/38, B61C15/14 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
B61C9/50 (EP);
B61F3/16 (EP);
B61F5/38 (EP);
F16H3/724 (EP);
F16H37/0806 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/51] | B61C9/50, B61F3/16, B61F5/38 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/48] |
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Achseinheit für Schienenfahrzeuge | [1999/51] | English: | Axle assembly for railway vehicles | [1999/51] | French: | Ensemble-essieu pour véhicules ferroviaires | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 23.09.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 02.03.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 26.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 11.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Request for further processing for: | 14.11.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 14.11.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.12.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.10.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0770533 (LINKE HOFMANN BUSCH GES MIT BE [DE]) [X] 1,8 * column 6, line 4 - line 44; figures 5-7 *; | [A]US5017183 (TERAOKA MASAO [JP]) [A] 1,4-6 * column 6, line 59 - line 66; figures 3,4 *; | [A]GB201921 (KAREL WILLEM GERARD JOHAN STOF) | by applicant | DE461730 |