EP0962925 - Disc reproducing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Susumu, Pioneer Electronic Corporation 25-1, Aza Nishimachi, Ooaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken 350-0822 / JP | 02 /
Uchiyama, Kenji, Pioneer Electronic Corporation 25-1, Aza Nishimachi, Ooaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken 350-0822 / JP | 03 /
Kimura, Tomomichi, Pioneer Electronic Corporation 25-1, Aza Nishimachi, Ooaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken 350-0822 / JP | 04 /
Ido, Kenjiro, Pioneer Electronic Corporation 25-1, Aza Nishimachi, Ooaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken 350-0822 / JP | 05 /
Suzuki, Toru, Pioneer Electronic Corporation 25-1, Aza Nishimachi, Ooaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken 350-0822 / JP | 06 /
Mizoguchi, Takashi, Pioneer Electronic Corporation 25-1, Aza Nishimachi, Ooaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken 350-0822 / JP | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/49] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99110634.5 | 02.06.1999 | [1999/49] | Priority number, date | JP19980154826 | 03.06.1998 Original published format: JP 15482698 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0962925 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0962925 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0962925 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/22 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
G11B17/021 (EP,US);
G11B17/223 (EP,US);
G11B33/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/05] |
Former [1999/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Plattenwiedergabegerät | [1999/49] | English: | Disc reproducing device | [1999/49] | French: | Dispositif de reproduction de disques | [1999/49] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 22.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 30.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.12.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19725169 (FUJITSU TEN LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 27 - column 6, line 14; figures 2,8 * [A] 3-5; | [A]US5138591 (OGAWA TUTOMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * figures 9,16 * |