EP0964128 - Joining system for door frames and window frames [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/50] | Combined joining system for door frames and window frames | ||
[2005/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alpi Fenster GmbH - Srl Via Giovo, 140 39010 Rifiano (BZ) / IT | [2005/41] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states Alpi Fenster GmbH - Srl Via Giovo, 140 39010 Rifiano (BZ) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pixner, Adolf Via Giovo, 140 39010 Rifiano (BZ) / IT | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Oberosler, Ludwig Oberosler SAS, Via Dante, 20/A, CP 307 39100 Bolzano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | Oberosler, Ludwig Oberosler SAS, Via Dante, 20/A, CP 307 39100 Bolzano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99110752.5 | 04.06.1999 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | IT1998BZ00038 | 12.06.1998 Original published format: IT BZ980038 | [1999/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0964128 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0964128 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | [2001/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964128 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/96 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
E06B3/984 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2002/21] |
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbindungssystem für Tür- und Fensterstöcke | [2005/22] | English: | Joining system for door frames and window frames | [2005/22] | French: | Système de jonction pour châssis de porte et de fenêtre | [2005/22] |
Former [1999/50] | Kombiniertes Verbindungssystem für Tür- und Fensterstöcke | ||
Former [1999/50] | Combined joining system for door frames and window frames | ||
Former [1999/50] | Système de jonction combiné pour châssis de porte et de fenêtre | Examination procedure | 14.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 03.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.10.2005 | [2017/40] |
Former [2009/01] | FR | 12.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2155729 (ANTHONY MAINIERI) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]CH545904 (JOST MÜLLER) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2640311 (CHARPENTE MENUISERIE CHASSENEUILLAISE [FR]) [A] 1-3* abstract *; | [A]EP0738570 (FENTECH AG [CH]) [A] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * column 2, line 34 - line 56; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE19540568 (ACHENBACH KLAUS [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 40; figures 1,2 * |