EP0976941 - Synchronizer for a vehicle transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Körber, Martin Ahrenweg 28 85375 Neufahrn / DE | [2000/05] | Application number, filing date | 99110849.9 | 07.06.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | DE1998134544 | 31.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19834544 | [2000/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0976941 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0976941 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16D23/06 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
F16D23/06 (EP);
F16D2023/0618 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/41] |
Former [2000/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Synchronisiereinrichtung für ein Fahrzeuggetriebe | [2000/05] | English: | Synchronizer for a vehicle transmission | [2000/05] | French: | Synchronisateur pour une transmission de véhicule | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 10.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06257624 ; | [A]DE19500935 (INST MASCHINENELEMENTE UNI STU [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 47; figures 3-5 *; | [A]DE19545519 (SAAB AUTOMOBILE [SE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5269400 (FOGELBERG MARK J [US]) [A] 3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941214), vol. 018, no. 660, Database accession no. (M - 1722), & JP06257624 A 19940916 (AISAN IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | DE9318792U |