EP1059056 - Dust bag and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dijkman Bertus Komoord 4 4824 LK Breda / NL | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 99110894.5 | 08.06.1999 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1059056 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1059056 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/14, B31B41/00, B31B19/90, B31B19/16 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
A47L9/14 (EP,US);
B31B2160/106 (EP,US);
B31B2241/008 (EP);
B31B70/148 (EP,US);
B31B70/16 (EP,US);
B31B70/81 (EP,US);
Y10S55/02 (EP,US);
Y10T156/12 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1304 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1309 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2001/36] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Saubsaugerbeutel und Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben | [2000/50] | English: | Dust bag and method for manufacturing the same | [2000/50] | French: | Sac à poussières et procédé pour le fabriquer | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 14.06.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT | 09.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.07.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.07.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.07.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.07.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.07.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH0838402 ; | [AD]JPH0838403 ; | [A]GB954996 (HEEM V D NV) [A] 1-3,6-11,14 * page 1, line 50 - page 2, line 30 * * figure - *; | [A]US3751881 (HUGHES G) [A] 1-3,6-11,14 * column 3, line 50 - line 62 * * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 19 * * figures 2-4,6-8 *; | [AD]DE2310160 (HONSEL KARL-HEINZ) [AD] 1,6,8-11,14,16-19,21,22 * page 7, paragraph 1 - page 8, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-4 *; | [AD]DE2416079 (FINDER KLAUS) [AD] 1 * page 7, paragraph 2 ** figure 3 *; | [AD]DE2806305 (VOIT GEB) [AD] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0179950 (WOODLEY RAYMOND LESLIE) [AD] 1,6,8-11,14 * abstract * * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 15 * * figures 1,2,4-6 *; | [A]EP0813839 (ELECTROLUX AB [SE]) [A] 1,2,6,8-11,14 * abstract * * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 54 * * claims 4,5 * * figure - * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, & JP08038402 A 19960213 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [AD] 1,6-11,14 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, & JP08038403 A 19960213 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [AD] 1,6,8-11,14 * abstract * |