blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976323

EP0976323 - Insect-killing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.08.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.10.2003  [2003/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MULTITECNO S.r.l.
Via ITA MARZOTTO 8
30025 Fossalta Di Portogruaro (Prov. of Venezia) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
MULTITECNO S.r.l.
Via ITA MARZOTTO 8
30025 Fossalta Di Portogruaro (Prov. of Venezia) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Reatti, Guido
Via Jacopo Filiasi 55
35128 Padova / IT
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido, et al
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al
Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99110911.704.06.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateIT1998VE0002510.06.1998         Original published format: IT VE980025
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976323
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976323
Date:03.05.2000
[2000/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976323
Date:09.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2000
ClassificationIPC:A01M1/04, A01M1/14
[2000/05]
CPC:
A01M1/145 (EP); A01M2200/012 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   PT [2001/02]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Insektentöttendes Gerät[2000/05]
English:Insect-killing device[2000/05]
French:Dispositif d'extermination des insectes[2000/05]
Examination procedure27.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
18.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2002Fee for grant paid
06.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipPT09.01.2003
[2003/29]
Documents cited:Search[DA]US5651211  (REGAN HAROLD R [US], et al) [DA] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9511589  (KITTERMAN ROGER L [US]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 1 - line 11 * * page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 15; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9220224  (RENTOKIL LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * page 12, line 11 - page 14, line 15; figure -; claim - *
by applicantUS5651211
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.