EP0990448 - Valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maquet Critical Care AB Röntgenvägen 2 171 95 Solna / SE | [2004/13] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states Siemens-Elema AB Röntgenvägen 2 171 95 Solna 1 / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Höglund, Kasper Hagsätervägen 9 144 63 Rönninge / SE | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Stein, Jan, et al Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | Stein, Jan Anders Lennart, et al Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/13] | Samzelius, Roger Mikael, et al Maquet Critical Care AB Patent Department 171 95 Solna / SE | Application number, filing date | 99110955.4 | 08.06.1999 | [2000/14] | Priority number, date | SE19980002761 | 19.08.1998 Original published format: SE 9802761 | [2000/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0990448 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0990448 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0990448 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP0990448 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/20 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
A61M16/08 (EP,US);
A61M16/0833 (EP,US);
A61M16/0866 (EP,US);
A61M16/20 (EP,US);
A61M16/206 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,US);
Y10S128/911 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2001/31] |
Former [2000/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ventil | [2000/14] | English: | Valve | [2000/14] | French: | Valve | [2000/14] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 16.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3995643 (MERAV ABRAHAM D) [A] 1,7 * column 5, line 21 - line 52; figures 3A-3C *; | [A]US5050593 (POON CHI-SANG [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 21; figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO9321982 (UNIV NEW YORK [US]) [A] 1,5-7 * page 5, line 18 - page 7, line 16; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP0615764 (PURITAN BENNETT CORP [US]) [A] 1,7* column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 53; figures 2-3B *; | [A]WO9528193 (BOESHERZ JAKOB [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,5-8 * page 7, line 11 - page 13, line 7; figure 1 * | by applicant | US4006634 | US4938077 | US5002050 |