EP0967117 - Information device for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niefenecker, Jens Am Försterkamp 2 38550 Isenbüttel / DE | 02 /
Schulze, Heinz-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Thomas-Dehler-Weg 16 31141 Hildesheim / DE | [2000/05] |
Former [1999/52] | 01 /
Niefenecker, Jens Am Försterkamp 2 38550 Isenbüttel / DE | ||
02 /
Schulze, Heinz-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Leinkampstrasse 7 31141 Hildesheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 99111002.4 | 10.06.1999 | [1999/52] | Priority number, date | DE1998135275 | 26.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19835275 | DE1998127762 | 23.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19827762 | [1999/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0967117 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0967117 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/12 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
B60R1/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT, SE [2000/36] |
Former [1999/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Informationseinrichtung für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [1999/52] | English: | Information device for a vehicle | [1999/52] | French: | Dispositif d'information pour véhicule | [1999/52] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 02.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Request for further processing for: | 19.07.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 19.07.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.08.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.06.2003 | PT | 16.07.2003 | SE | 16.07.2003 | [2005/11] |
Former [2004/02] | PT | 16.07.2003 | |
SE | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 16.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2044944 (BALLREICH); | [A]US5455716 (SUMAN MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [X]DE29703084U (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [E]EP0937601 (DONNELLY CORP [US]) [E] 1-15 * figure 15 * | by applicant | DE3720848 | DE3735847 | DE9010589U | DE4322937 | EP0667154 |