EP0965886 - Silver halide light-sensitive material comprising support, hardening layer and light-sensitive layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 250-0123 / JP | ||
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 210 Nakanuma, Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 250-0123 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoshi, Satoshi, Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 4000, Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | 02 /
Yanaka, Hiromitsu, Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 4000, Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99111070.1 | 16.06.1999 | [1999/51] | Priority number, date | JP19980185689 | 16.06.1998 Original published format: JP 18568998 | JP19980253227 | 24.08.1998 Original published format: JP 25322798 | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0965886 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0965886 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/028 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
G03F7/0952 (EP,US);
G03F7/0285 (EP,US);
Y10S430/11 (EP,US);
Y10S430/111 (EP,US);
Y10S430/155 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/35] |
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lichtempfindliches Silberhalogenidmaterial mit Träger, Härtungsschicht und lichtempfindlicher Schicht | [1999/51] | English: | Silver halide light-sensitive material comprising support, hardening layer and light-sensitive layer | [1999/51] | French: | Matériau à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière comprenant un support, couche durcissante et couche sensible à la lumière | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 24.06.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 23.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.07.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19522643 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [DA]JPH08194314 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08194314 A 19960730 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [DA] 1-15 * abstract * |