EP0964295 - Film positioning system and method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagumo, Hirobumi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/50] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99111162.6 | 08.06.1999 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | JP19980161115 | 09.06.1998 Original published format: JP 16111598 | [1999/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0964295 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/32, H04N3/40 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
H04N3/40 (EP,US);
G03B21/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/34] |
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Filmpositionierungssystem und Verfahren dazu | [1999/50] | English: | Film positioning system and method thereof | [1999/50] | French: | Système et méthode de positionnement de film | [1999/50] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 28.03.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08340481 ; | [A]US5474245 (GUNDAY ERHAN H [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * column 5 - column 20; figures 1-8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 97, no. 4, & JP08340481 A 19961224 (SONY CORP.) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * |