EP1059207 - Passenger restraint system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maurer Söhne GmbH & Co. KG Frankfurter Ring 193 80807 München / DE | [2000/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heilmeier, Günter Motorstrasse 30 80809 München / DE | 02 /
Distelrath, Volker, c/o Maurer Söhne GmbH & Co.KG Frankfurter Ring 193 80807 München / DE | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner Grosse Bockhorni Schumacher Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99111429.9 | 11.06.1999 | [2000/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1059207 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/02 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
B60R21/02 (EP);
B60R2021/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/36] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fahrgastrückhaltesystem | [2000/50] | English: | Passenger restraint system | [2000/50] | French: | Système de retenue de passager | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 14.06.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 22.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/01] | 02.08.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0911224 (GIOVANOLA FRERES SA [CH]) [A] 1 * column 1 - column 2, line 25 * * abstract *; | [A]US5529382 (BURKAT ALEXANDER [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,17 * column A; figure - * * column 4, line 38 - column 7, line 28 * |