EP0965396 - Coil forming head for wire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/21] |
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
David, Siegfried Mozartstrasse 10 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | 02 /
Keller, Karl Auf der Hütte 12 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [1999/51] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99111452.1 | 12.06.1999 | [1999/51] | Priority number, date | DE1998127349 | 19.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19827349 | [1999/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0965396 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0965396 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | [2001/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0965396 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B21C47/14 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
B21C47/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, GB, IT, SE [2002/01] |
Former [2001/46] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Legekopf eines Windungslegers für Draht | [1999/51] | English: | Coil forming head for wire | [1999/51] | French: | Tête de formation de boucles de fil | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 12.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 22.08.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 07.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT | 23.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.09.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.10.2001 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   06.11.2001 | 17.10.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   06.11.2001 | 17.10.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   06.11.2001 | 17.10.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2001 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   06.11.2001 | 17.10.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2001 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   06.11.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0067127 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 1 - line 10; figure - *; | [A]US4644773 (DURI ANTONINO [IT]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 50 - line 60; figure - *; | [DA]EP0554976 (MORGAN CONSTRUCTION CO [US]) [DA] 1,2,4,5* column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 17; figure - *; | [A]EP0779115 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 36 - line 39 * * column 4, line 11 - line 23; figure - * | by applicant | EP0554976 |