blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0974505

EP0974505 - Method of controlling a brake system of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Reiner, Michael
Freibergstrasse 9
70736 Fellbach / DE
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date99111454.712.06.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE199813287522.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19832875
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974505
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974505
Date:18.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:B60T13/66, B60T13/58, B60T8/18, B60T8/26, B60T10/00
[2000/04]
CPC:
B60T8/268 (EP,US); B60T10/00 (EP,US); B60T13/585 (EP,US);
B60T13/66 (EP,US); B60T8/00 (EP,US); B60T8/1887 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/40]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Steuerung der Bremsanlage eines Fahrzeugs[2000/04]
English:Method of controlling a brake system of a vehicle[2000/04]
French:Procédé pour contrôler le système de freinage d'un véhicule[2000/04]
Examination procedure01.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
24.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2002Fee for grant paid
22.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9318949  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * page 13, line 5 - page 24, line 12 *;
 [A]EP0689978  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1* page 4, line 1 - line 27; figures 1-6B *;
 [A]DE19604391  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 14 - column 7, line 8; figures 1-4 *;
 [E]DE19822859  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [E] 1 * column W *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.