Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI0972568T | 31.08.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP99111766 | 18.06.1999 | ITMI981633 | 16.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4338830B | Global Dossier | 07.10.2009 | B2 | JP2000042410 | 15.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI981633 | 16.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU752559B | Global Dossier | 19.09.2002 | B2 | AU3580099 | 17.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI981633 | 16.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0972568 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2004 | B1 | EP0972568 | 19.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI981633 | 16.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR019930 | 27.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI981633 | 16.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE263625T | 15.04.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI981633 | 16.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9902825 | 23.02.2010 | B1 | BR9902825 | 11.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI981633 | 16.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1117617C | 13.08.2003 | C | CN1243037 | 02.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI981633 | 16.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69916180T | 14.04.2005 | T2 | DE69916180D1 | 13.05.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI981633 | 16.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0972568T | 02.08.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITMI981633 | 16.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2216381T | 16.10.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITMI981633 | 16.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITMI981633 | 16.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI981633 | 16.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT972568E | 30.07.2004 | E | Priority number | Date | ITMI981633 | 16.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6355856 | 12.03.2002 | B2 | US2001051759 | 13.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI981633 | 16.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA994205 | 10.01.2000 | B | Priority number | Date | ITMI981633 | 16.07.1998 |