EP0972568 - Molybdenum containing catalyst and its use in the isomerization of n-paraffins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale E. Mattei, 1 00144 Rome / IT | For all designated states ENITECNOLOGIE S.p.A. Via F. Maritano, 26 20097 S. Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale Enrico Mattei 1 00144 Roma / IT | ||
For all designated states ENITECNOLOGIE S.p.A. Via F. Maritano, 26 20097 S. Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT | |||
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states AGIP PETROLI S.p.A. Via Laurentina 449 00142 Roma / IT | ||
For all designated states ENITECNOLOGIE S.p.A. Via F. Maritano, 26 20097 S. Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peratello, Stefano Via Don Zonca, 1/A Besana in Brianza / IT | 02 /
Carati, Angela Via Rosselli 6 Zivido S. Giuliano Mil.se (Milano) / IT | 03 /
Bellussi, Giuseppe Via Scoto, 44 Piacenza / IT | 04 /
Rizzo, Caterina Via Fermi, 2/C S.Donato Mil.se (Milano) / IT | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2001/48] | Bordonaro, Salvatore, et al EniTecnologie S.p.A. Patent and Licensing Dept. Via Felice Maritano 26 20097 S. Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | ||
Former [2000/03] | Gennari, Marco, Dr. c/o EniTecnologie S.p.A., BREL, Via F. Maritano, 26 20097 San Donato Milanese, Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99111766.4 | 18.06.1999 | [2000/03] | Priority number, date | IT1998MI01633 | 16.07.1998 Original published format: IT MI981633 | [2000/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0972568 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0972568 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/28, C07C5/27, C07C9/00 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
B01J23/28 (EP,US);
C07C5/2772 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C5/2772, C07C9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] | Extension states | AL | 18.06.1999 | LT | 18.06.1999 | LV | 18.06.1999 | MK | 18.06.1999 | RO | 18.06.1999 | SI | 18.06.1999 | Title | German: | Molybdenkatalysator und seine Verwendung für die Isomerisierung von n-Paraffine | [2000/03] | English: | Molybdenum containing catalyst and its use in the isomerization of n-paraffins | [2000/03] | French: | Catalyseur à base de molybdène et son utilisation pour l'isomérisation des n-parrafines | [2003/32] |
Former [2000/03] | Catalyseur à base de molybdène etson utilisation pour l'isomérisation des n-parrafines | Examination procedure | 20.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 12.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3108974 (CARR NORMAN L) [Y] 8-11* claims 1,4,5 *; | [XY]WO8606063 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [X] 1,4-7 * example 1; claims 1,3 * * page 9, paragraph 2 * [Y] 8-11; | [A]EP0280342 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [A]EP0421781 (ARCO CHEM TECH [US]) |