EP0982722 - System and method for providing wireless control signals to a cartridge access device in a cartridge storage system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holmquist, Thomas W. 906 Breakwater Drive Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | 02 /
Schmidtke, Gregg S. 4607 Kitchell Way Fort Collins, CO 80524 / US | 03 /
Reasoner, Kelly J. 2442 Yorkshire Street Fort Collins, CO 80526 / US | 04 /
Boyd, David W. 458 North Brisbane Avenue Greeley, CO 80634 / US | 05 /
Williams, Bruce G. 1229 North Wilson Avenue, Apt. 204 Loveland, CO 80537 / US | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99111811.8 | 18.06.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | US19980143688 | 28.08.1998 Original published format: US 143688 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0982722 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0982722 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982722 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/68, G11B17/22 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
G11B33/125 (EP,US);
G11B17/22 (EP,US);
G11B17/225 (EP,US);
G11B17/228 (EP,US);
G11B33/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/38] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | System und Verfahren um drahtlose Steuersignale zu einer Kassettenübergabeeinheit in einem Kassettenmagazinsystem zu liefern | [2000/09] | English: | System and method for providing wireless control signals to a cartridge access device in a cartridge storage system | [2000/09] | French: | nystème et méthode pour envoyer des signaux de commande sans fil à un dispositif de transport de cassettes dans un magasin de cassettes | [2003/45] |
Former [2000/09] | Système et méthode pour envoyer des signaux de commande sans fil à un dispositif de transport de cassettes dans un magasin des cassettes | Examination procedure | 31.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03002936.7 / EP1318516 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5395199 (DAY III KENNETH F [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 6, line 20 - line 33; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0768657 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * column 13, line 40 - column 15, line 26; figures 1,15,16 * |