blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0969409

EP0969409 - Method for producing a chip card and corresponding chip card [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.03.2004  [2004/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orga Kartensysteme GmbH
An der Kapelle 2
33104 Paderborn / DE
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Isberner, Roland
Tiroler Ring 178
24147 Kiel / DE
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date99111832.419.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateDE199812961702.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19829617
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969409
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969409
Date:04.12.2002
[2002/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.2002
ClassificationIPC:G06K19/077
[2000/01]
CPC:
G06K19/07745 (EP); H01L2224/48091 (EP); H05K1/182 (EP);
H05K3/305 (EP)
C-Set:
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/35]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Varfahren zur Herstellung einer Chipkarte sowie nach dem Verfahren hergestellte Chipkarte[2000/01]
English:Method for producing a chip card and corresponding chip card[2000/01]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'une carte à puce et une carte à puce ainsi réalisée[2000/01]
Examination procedure05.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/10]
02.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.07.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
15.07.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
15.07.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
15.07.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
15.07.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
15.07.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
15.07.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
15.07.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
15.07.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
15.07.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
15.07.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
15.07.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
15.07.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
15.07.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
15.07.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
15.07.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
15.07.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
15.07.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
15.07.2003M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5057679  (AUDIC BERNARD ET AL) [X] 3 * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 35 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 1;
 [Y]DE19502157  (ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 7 - line 16 * * figure 3 *;
 [XA]EP0757330  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH) [X] 3 * column 4, line 2 - column 5, line 12 * * figures 2,3 * [A] 1;
 [A]WO9806061  (GEMPLUS CARD INT ;PERMINGEAT VINCENT (FR)) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4746392  (HOPPE JOACHIM) [A] 1,3 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 44 * * figures 2-6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.