14.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
30.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
24.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] |
17.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] |
20.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
10.07.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
11.06.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] |
28.05.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] |
27.02.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] |
13.02.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] |
06.02.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] |
30.01.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] |
12.12.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] |
18.07.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] |
10.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.07.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.02.2003 |
Change - inventor |
published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] |
05.02.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.12.2002 |
First examination report |
|
18.12.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.08.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
12.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.04.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 06.06.2001 [2001/23] |
06.10.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.11.2000 [2000/47] |
04.08.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] |
11.12.1999 |
Change - inventor |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
12.11.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] |
31.08.1999 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
11.08.1999 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|