Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0967441 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2003 | B1 | EP0967441 | 20.09.2000 | A3 | EP0967441 | 29.12.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19828640 | 26.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE249015T | 15.09.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE19828640 | 26.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19828640 | 30.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19828640 | 26.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59906827D1 | 09.10.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19828640 | 26.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6114665 | 05.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19828640 | 26.06.1998 |