EP1005963 - Punching device comprising removable stamps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Groz-Beckert Kommanditgesellschaft Parkweg 2 72458 Albstadt / DE | [2000/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beerhalter, Siegfried Weilerstrasse 75 73529 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a. N. / DE | Application number, filing date | 99112221.9 | 25.06.1999 | [2000/23] | Priority number, date | DE19981055578 | 02.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19855578 | [2000/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1005963 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1005963 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1005963 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B26F1/04, B26F1/02, B23D35/00, B26D7/26, H05K3/00 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
H05K3/005 (EP,US);
B26F1/04 (EP,US);
B28B11/12 (EP,US);
B26F2210/08 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
Y10T83/8727 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/23] | B26F1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/19] |
Former [2000/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stanzeinrichtung mit wechselbaren Stempeln | [2000/23] | English: | Punching device comprising removable stamps | [2000/23] | French: | Dispositif de poinçonnage ayant des poinçons remplaçables | [2000/23] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 28.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4685613 (SCHAMBRE FRANK [US]) [X] 1-5,20 * abstract * [Y] 6-8; | [YA]EP0423052 (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * [A] 9-20; | [YA]US5076127 (OTTO GERHARD [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * [A] 9-20; | [XY]US5090284 (NAKAJIMA KIYOHARU [JP]) [X] 1-7,20 * the whole document * [Y] 8; | [XY]US5214991 (SHIMIZU IZUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,20 * abstract * [Y] 6-8; | [A]US5233895 (CONESKI ANTHONY F [US], et al) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [A]EP0583537 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |