blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973204

EP0973204 - Method of manufacturing a MOS-Transistor device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/03]MOS-Transistor with enhanced withstanding voltage and reduced on-resistance
[2005/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.02.2007  [2007/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELMOS Semiconductor AG
Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 1
44227 Dortmund / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
ELMOS Semiconductor AG
Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 1
44227 Dortmund / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gehrmann, Andreas
Verbindungsweg 18
44267 Dortmund / DE
02 / Bornefeld, Ralf
Grünental 2
58579 Schalksmühle / DE
[2000/13]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date99112270.625.06.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateDE199812852226.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19828522
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973204
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0973204
Date:25.07.2001
[2001/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973204
Date:01.03.2006
Language:DE
[2006/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.06.2001
ClassificationIPC:H01L29/78, H01L21/336, H01L21/266, H01L21/8234
[2001/30]
CPC:
H10D30/0221 (EP,US); H10D30/603 (EP,US); H10D62/151 (EP);
H10D84/013 (EP,US); H10D84/038 (EP,US); H10D84/83 (EP,US);
H10D64/516 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2000/03]H01L29/78
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL [2002/16]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer MOS-Transistoranordnung[2005/33]
English:Method of manufacturing a MOS-Transistor device[2005/33]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication d'un dispositif de transistor MOS[2005/33]
Former [2000/03]MOS-Transistor mit hoher Spannungsfestigkeit und niedrigem Einschaltwiderstand
Former [2000/03]MOS-Transistor with enhanced withstanding voltage and reduced on-resistance
Former [2000/03]Transistor MOS avec tension de claquage élevée et resistance passante reduite
Examination procedure24.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/43]
26.02.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.06.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, LU, MC, PT, SE
22.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.12.2005Fee for grant paid
09.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.03.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
07.03.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
07.03.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
07.03.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
07.03.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
07.03.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
07.03.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
07.03.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
07.03.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH0730107  ;
 [DA]WO9713277  (EL MOS ELEKTRONIK IN MOS TECHN [DE], et al);
ExaminationUS5075242
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.