EP0967083 - Ink injection method, ink injection device, and ink-jet recording apparatus provided with the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsukuda, Keiichiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/52] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/52] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99112354.8 | 28.06.1999 | [1999/52] | Priority number, date | JP19980201181 | 28.06.1998 Original published format: JP 20118198 | JP19990168892 | 15.06.1999 Original published format: JP 16889299 | [1999/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0967083 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0967083 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
B41J2/17523 (EP,US);
B41J2/17509 (EP,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/01] |
Former [1999/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tinteneinspritzverfahren, Tinteneinspritzgerät und mit diesen ausgestattetes Tintenstrahlaufnahmegerät | [1999/52] | English: | Ink injection method, ink injection device, and ink-jet recording apparatus provided with the same | [1999/52] | French: | Méthode d'injection d'encre, système d'injection d'encre et appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre les utilisant | [1999/52] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 27.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/32] | 07.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4639738 (YOUNG LAWRENCE R [US], et al); | [DX]EP0803364 (CANON KK [JP]) [DX] 5-12 * column 10, line 26 - column 13, line 42; figure 3 * * column 14, line 21 - line 43; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0803362 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 5,9,11 * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 22; figure 1 * * column 6, line 34 - column 11, line 48; figure 4 *; | [A]WO9744194 (GEN ELECTRIC CO PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0832748 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) | by applicant | JPH0640043 | JPH09234881 | JPH1029318 |