EP0969648 - Method and system to secure a telecommunication link [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/01] | Methode and system to secure a telecommunication link | ||
[2005/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Von Essen, Dieter Südstrasse 8 82008 Unterhaching / DE | 02 /
Gilch, Gerhard, Dr. Heinleinstrasse 12 81477 München / DE | [2000/01] | Application number, filing date | 99112358.9 | 24.06.1999 | [2000/01] | Priority number, date | DE1998129222 | 30.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19829222 | [2000/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0969648 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0969648 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/54, H04M3/42, H04M3/22, H04Q3/66 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
H04M3/12 (EP);
H04M3/54 (EP);
H04Q3/66 (EP);
H04M3/533 (EP);
H04M7/00 (EP);
H04M7/006 (EP);
H04Q2213/13097 (EP);
H04Q2213/13098 (EP);
H04Q2213/13102 (EP);
H04Q2213/13109 (EP);
H04Q2213/13141 (EP);
H04Q2213/13167 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/37] |
Former [2000/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Sicherstellung einer Kommunikationsverbindung | [2000/01] | English: | Method and system to secure a telecommunication link | [2005/39] | French: | Méthode et système pour la sécurisation d'une communication téléphonique | [2000/01] |
Former [2000/01] | Methode and system to secure a telecommunication link | Examination procedure | 21.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 05.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Request for further processing for: | 24.02.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 24.02.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.03.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5751789 (FARRIS ROBERT D ET AL) [X] 1,8,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 15 - column 3, line 53 * |