blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970763

EP0970763 - Apparatus for the production of a corrugated tube by heical coiling of a thin undulated strip [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 24.01.2007  [2007/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fritz Hahn GmbH & Co. KG
Eurener Strasse 51-53
D-54294 Trier / DE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Anton, Hans-Georg
Fritz-Quant-Strasse 40
54294 Trier / DE
02 / Hahn, Horst, Dipl.Ing.
Ringstrasse 25a
81375 München / DE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Serwe, Karl-Heinz
Patentanwalt
Südallee 34
54290 Trier / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Serwe, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Südallee 34
54290 Trier / DE
Application number, filing date99112526.101.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateDE199813040108.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19830401
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970763
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0970763
Date:09.05.2001
[2001/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970763
Date:02.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2001
ClassificationIPC:B21C37/12
[2000/02]
CPC:
B21C37/124 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
Extension statesLT26.07.1999
LV26.07.1999
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Herstellen eines Wellrohres durch schraubenlinienförmiges Wickeln eines dünnen gewellten Bandes[2000/02]
English:Apparatus for the production of a corrugated tube by heical coiling of a thin undulated strip[2000/02]
French:Dispositif de fabrication d'un tube ondulé par enroulement hélicoidal d'une mince bande ondulée[2000/02]
Examination procedure25.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/34]
09.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2002Fee for grant paid
31.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI02.04.2003
IE02.04.2003
CY01.07.2003
DK02.07.2003
GR02.07.2003
[2007/04]
Former [2004/36]FI02.04.2003
CY01.07.2003
DK02.07.2003
GR02.07.2003
Former [2004/23]FI02.04.2003
DK02.07.2003
GR02.07.2003
Former [2004/05]FI02.04.2003
GR02.07.2003
Former [2004/02]GR02.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]US3863480  (MESEROLE ROBERT H) [A] 1* column 4, lines 5-25; figures 3,4 *;
 [AD]DE3047518  (HAHN FRITZ KG [DE]) [AD] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [AD]EP0182001  (HAHN FRITZ KG [DE]) [AD] 1 * page 6, lines 17-20; figure 1 *;
 [AD]EP0222285  (HAHN FRITZ KG [DE]) [AD] 1 * figure 5; claim 1 *
by applicantDE3022575
 EP0182001
 DE3540125
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.