EP0968754 - Catalyst for reducing nitrogen oxides in oxidizing or reducing atmosphere [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMG AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | [2001/46] |
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states dmc2 Degussa Metals Catalysts Cerdec AG 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van den Tillaart, Hans, Dr. Schillerstrasse 30 63579 Freigericht / DE | 02 /
Leyrer, Jürgen, Dr. Vogteistrasse 41a 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | 03 /
Strehlau, Wolfgang, Dr. Bergstrasse 30 b 69221 Dossenheim / DE | 04 /
Lox, Egbert, Dr. Greifenhagenstrasse 12 b 63457 Hanau / DE | 05 /
Kreuzer, Thomas, Dr. Philipp-Reis-Strasse 13 61184 Karben / DE | 06 /
Plog, Carsten, Dr. Doellenstrasse 13 88677 Markdorf / DE | 07 /
Andorf, Renato, Dr. Normannenweg 112 88090 Immenstaad / DE | 08 /
Markert, Norbert Kippenhauserstrasse 22 88677 Markdorf / DE | 09 /
Stengel, Thomas Müllerstrasse 25 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2000/03] |
Former [2000/01] | 01 /
Van den Tillaart, Hans, Dr. Schillerstrasse 30 63579 Freigericht / DE | ||
02 /
Leyrer, Jürgen, Dr. Vogteistrasse 41a 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | |||
03 /
Strehlau, Wolfgang, Dr. Bergstrasse 30 b 69221 Dossenheim / DE | |||
04 /
Lox, Egbert, Dr. Greifenhagenstrasse 12 b 63457 Hanau / DE | |||
05 /
Kreuzer, Thomas, Dr. Philipp-Reis-Strasse 13 61184 Karben / DE | |||
06 /
Plog, Carsten, Dr. Doellenstrasse 13 88677 Markdorf / DE | |||
07 /
Andorf, Renato, Dr. Hauptstrasse 201 88074 Meckenbeuren / DE | |||
08 /
Markert, Norbert Happenweiler Strasse 2 88090 Immstaad / DE | |||
09 /
Stengel, Thomas Müllerstrasse 25 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | Representative(s) | Stellbrink, Axel, et al Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Stellbrink, Axel, et al Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/46] | Herrmann, Reinhard OMG AG FI-PAT Postfach 1351 63403 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 99112537.8 | 01.07.1999 | [2000/01] | Priority number, date | DE1998129976 | 04.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19829976 | [2000/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0968754 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, B01J23/46 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
B01D53/9418 (EP,US);
B01J23/46 (KR);
B01J23/468 (EP,US);
B01J35/393 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1028 (EP,US);
B01D2255/504 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | Katalysator zur Reduktion von Stickoxiden in oxidierender und reduzierender Atmosphäre | [2000/01] | English: | Catalyst for reducing nitrogen oxides in oxidizing or reducing atmosphere | [2000/01] | French: | Catalyseur pour la réduction des oxydes d'azote dans une atmosphère reductrice ou oxydante | [2000/01] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 30.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/37] | 27.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/37] | Request for further processing for: | 06.02.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 06.02.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.03.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH0780315 ; | [A]US5413976 (TAKAMI AKIHIDE [JP], et al); | [X]EP0730900 (N E CHEMCAT CORP [JP]); |