blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0969284

EP0969284 - Investigation of interaction between cellular molecules and their localisation in cells [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paysan, Jacques
Strebelstrasse 3
70599 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Antz, Christof
Schwärzlocher Strasse 60
72070 Tübingen / DE
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Fuhlendorf, Jörn
Dreiss Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Fuhlendorf, Jörn, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99112544.401.07.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateDE199812949502.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19829495
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969284
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.1999
ClassificationIPC:G01N33/542, G01N33/50, C12N15/85, C12Q1/68
[2000/01]
CPC:
G01N33/542 (EP); G01N33/5008 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/38]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Untersuchung von Wechselwirkungen zwischen zellulären Molekülen und deren Lokalisation in Zellen[2000/01]
English:Investigation of interaction between cellular molecules and their localisation in cells[2000/01]
French:Etudes des interactions entre molécules cellulaires et de leur localisation dans les cellules[2000/01]
Examination procedure06.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/14]
10.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/14]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
01.09.2000M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9727212  (RIGEL PHARMACEUTICALS INC) [X] 1 * page 50, line 5 - line 30 *;
 [DA]WO9712912  (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT ;CHASSAING GERARD (FR); PROCHIANTZ ALAIN (F) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [PA]WO9912033  (RUPPERSBERG PETER ;ANTZ CHRISTOF (DE); HERLITZE STEFAN (DE); PAYSA) [PA] 1-21 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.