EP1067831 - Semiconductor switching device, particularly for high current inverter with low intermediate circuit voltage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allwang, Reinhard Sitzenhofer Strasse 15 92421 Schwandorf / DE | [2001/02] | Application number, filing date | 99112558.4 | 01.07.1999 | [2001/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1067831 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1067831 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, H02M7/00 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
H02M7/003 (EP);
H05K7/209 (EP);
H05K7/20927 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2001/39] |
Former [2001/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Halbleiter-Schaltungsanordnung, insbesondere Hochstromumrichter mit niedriger Zwischenkreisspannung | [2001/02] | English: | Semiconductor switching device, particularly for high current inverter with low intermediate circuit voltage | [2001/02] | French: | Dispositif de commutation à semiconducteur, notamment pour onduleurs à courants forts avec circuit intermédiaire à faible tension | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 06.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5060112 (COCCONI ALAN G) [X] 1 * column 3, line 1 - line 46 *; | [A]US5396404 (KING DAVID A ET AL) [A] 9-11 * figure 10 *; | [AD]DE19645636 (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 29 - line 46 *; | [A]US5914860 (JANKO STEVEN P); | [A]WO9627942 (CURTIS INSTR) |