Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | DE | | FR | | GB | | IT | | NL | | Examination procedure | 17.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | European patent granted | 27.03.2002 | Opposition procedure | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2003 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 10.07.2002 | | Event description: | GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977) | Effective DATE: | 20020613 | | Event date: | 23.08.2002 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 19.03.2003 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20021230 | | Event date: | 29.03.2000 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE DE FR GB IT NL | | Event date: | 29.03.2000 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Event date: | 12.04.2000 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Event date: | 12.04.2000 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Event date: | 12.04.2000 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | Free Format Text: | 7H 05B 41/00 A, 7G 05F 1/00 B, 7H 01J 61/52 B, 7H 05B 37/02 B, 7H 05B 41/285 B, 7H 05B 41/38 B | | Event date: | 05.07.2000 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20000510 | | Event date: | 06.12.2000 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20001018 | | Event date: | 27.12.2000 | | Event description: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Free Format Text: | AT BE DE FR GB IT NL | | Event date: | 01.01.2002 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB IF02 | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01 | | Event date: | 27.03.2002 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE DE FR GB IT NL | | Event date: | 27.03.2002 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 215297 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20020415 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 02.05.2002 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 59901049 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20020502 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 28.11.2008 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20080613 | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Event date: | 30.06.2010 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20090702 | | Event date: | 31.10.2012 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20120709 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.12.2012 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20120810 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.12.2012 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20120726 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.12.2012 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20120802 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 28.03.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 59901049 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | OSRAM GMBH, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: OSRAM AG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE | Effective DATE: | 20130205 | | Event date: | 19.01.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 59901049 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | OSRAM GMBH, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE | Effective DATE: | 20111130 | | Event date: | 17.10.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 59901049 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | OSRAM GMBH, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE | Effective DATE: | 20130822 | | Event date: | 26.03.2014 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20130702 | | Event date: | 25.04.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20140331 | | Event date: | 31.01.2014 | | Event description: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M. | Effective DATE: | 20130731 | | Event date: | 30.04.2014 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20130702 | | Event date: | 30.04.2014 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20130731 | | Event date: | 30.05.2014 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20130731 | | Event date: | 30.05.2014 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20130702 | | Event date: | 17.10.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 59901049 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | LEDVANCE GMBH, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE | Effective DATE: | 20130822 | | Event date: | 28.03.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 59901049 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | LEDVANCE GMBH, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: OSRAM AG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE | Effective DATE: | 20130205 | | Event date: | 19.01.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 59901049 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | LEDVANCE GMBH, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE | Effective DATE: | 20111130 | | Event date: | 10.03.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 59901049 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | LEDVANCE GMBH, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 80807 MUENCHEN, DE | | Event date: | 06.09.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL PD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP | OWNER: | OSRAM GMBH; DE | Free Format Text: | DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), MERGE; FORMER OWNER NAME: PATENT-TREUHAND-GESELLSCHAFT FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH | Effective DATE: | 20170615 | | Event date: | 29.09.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20170725 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 31.01.2018 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20170929 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 06.03.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20180801 | | Event date: | 01.02.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 59901049 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190201 | | Event date: | 31.05.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180801 | | Event date: | 08.02.2002 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 04.01.2002 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 20.09.2001 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Event date: | 20.09.2001 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 29.08.2001 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Event date: | 25.02.2000 | | Event description: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Event date: | 11.02.2000 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 31.01.2003 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 31.01.2003 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |