EP0989785 - Circuit improvement for low pressure discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Klaus Pfarrer-Melcher-Weg 23 86316 Friedberg / DE | 02 /
Reiser, Ludwig Brahmsstrasse 31 86368 Gersthofen / DE | [2000/13] | Application number, filing date | 99112640.0 | 02.07.1999 | [2000/13] | Priority number, date | DE1998138830 | 26.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19838830 | [2000/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0989785 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0989785 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0989785 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/00, G05F1/00, H01J61/52, H05B37/02, H05B41/285, H05B41/38 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
H05B41/386 (EP,US);
H05B41/36 (KR);
H05B41/39 (EP,US);
Y10S315/05 (EP,US);
Y10S315/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/13] | H05B41/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/52] |
Former [2000/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbesserte Anlaufschaltung für Niederdruck-Entladungslampe | [2000/13] | English: | Circuit improvement for low pressure discharge lamp | [2000/13] | French: | Circuit amélioré pour lampe à décharge basse pression | [2000/13] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 18.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06283142 ; | [X]EP0483082 (MARELLI AUTRONICA [IT]) [X] 1-5 * column 1, lines 1-3 ** column 3, line 18 - column 7, line 24; figures 2,4; claims 1-7 *; | [X]US5404083 (NILSSEN OLE K [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 1, lines 26-30 * * column 4, line 6 - column 7, line 18; figure 1; claims 1-12 *; | [X]US5710489 (NILSSEN OLE K [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 19 * * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 47; figure 1; claims 1-15 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06283142 A 19941007 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOL CORP) [X] 1-5 * abstract * |