EP0986292 - Thermal transfer mat for electrical or electronic apparatuses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [2006/16] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Andreas Riedlstrasse 34 82216 Maisach / DE | 02 /
Forster, Franz An Bahnsteg 1 C 85614 Kirchseeon / DE | 03 /
Niedermeier, Peter Sonnentaustrasse 5 80995 München / DE | 04 /
Limmer, Walter Kaiserstrasse 40 80801 München / DE | [2000/11] | Application number, filing date | 99112642.6 | 02.07.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | DE1998141037 | 09.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19841037 | DE1998217185U | 24.09.1998 Original published format: DE 29817185 U | [2000/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0986292 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0986292 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986292 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
H05K7/20472 (EP,US);
F28F2013/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/11] | Title | German: | Wärmeleitende Einlegematte für elektrische und elektronische Geräte | [2000/11] | English: | Thermal transfer mat for electrical or electronic apparatuses | [2000/11] | French: | Coussin pour transférer la chaleur, appliqué aux appareils électriques et électroniques | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 30.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.04.2006 | IE | 19.04.2006 | LU | 02.07.2006 | DK | 19.07.2006 | GR | 20.07.2006 | ES | 30.07.2006 | CH | 31.07.2006 | LI | 31.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | PT | 19.09.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | IE | 19.04.2006 | |
LU | 02.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | IE | 19.04.2006 | |
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | IE | 19.04.2006 | |
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | IE | 19.04.2006 | |
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/18] | IE | 19.04.2006 | |
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | ES | 30.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4654754 (DASZKOWSKI JOSEPH M [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8 * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 21; figures 5A,6A *; | [A]GB2229041 (ELECTROLUBE LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1-11* page 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 *; | [A]US5161092 (SMITH WILLIAM A [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 55; figure 1 * |