EP0994544 - Housing part with mounting means for a cable-sleeve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/40] |
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eicher, Bernhard Uhuweg 9 70794 Filderstadt / DE | [2000/16] | Application number, filing date | 99112683.0 | 02.07.1999 | [2000/16] | Priority number, date | DE1998147456 | 15.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19847456 | [2000/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0994544 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0994544 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/08, B25F5/00 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
B25F5/00 (EP);
H02G3/083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [2001/01] |
Former [2000/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gehäuseteil mit Aufnahme für eine Kabeltülle | [2000/16] | English: | Housing part with mounting means for a cable-sleeve | [2000/16] | French: | Partie de boîtier avec logement pour manchon de câble | [2000/16] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 07.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2662110 (FIORI) [X] 1-4,9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4344635 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1 * figure - * |