EP0974501 - Seat belt with a buckle tongue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2001 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2001 [2001/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Möker, Carsten, Dipl.-Ing. Amselweg 4 38471 Rühen / DE | [2000/04] | Application number, filing date | 99112708.5 | 30.06.1999 | [2000/04] | Priority number, date | DE1998132467 | 18.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19832467 | [2000/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0974501 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/18 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
B60R22/18 (EP);
A44B11/2553 (EP);
A44B11/2561 (EP);
B60R2022/1812 (EP);
B60R2022/1825 (EP);
B60R22/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/40] |
Former [2000/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sicherheitsgurt mit einer Steckzunge | [2000/04] | English: | Seat belt with a buckle tongue | [2000/04] | French: | Ceinture de sécurité comportant un pêne de verrouillage | [2000/04] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/17] | 09.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.09.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.09.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4101171 (SASAKI SHIRO, et al) [X] 1,2,5,7 * column W * [Y] 4,8-11; | [DY]DE29502192U (TRW REPA GMBH [DE]) [DY] 4,8 * page 3, line 13 - line 21; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]FR2423235 (AUTOFLUG GMBH [DE]) [Y] 9-11 * figures 12-15; claims 1,4-6 *; | [X]FR2541954 (LAPORTE EUGENE [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,7 * page 2, line 9 - line 26; figure .; claim 1 *; | [X]FR2214490 (BUDD CO [US]) [X] 1,7 * page 2, line 2 - page 3, line 9; figure - *; | [DA]DE29510050U (TRW REPA GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-4,7,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5415433 (PFEIFFER ROBERT C [US]) [A] 1-3,5,9,10 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 18; figures 5-7 *; | [A]EP0416735 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7,9,12 * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 18; figures 1-6 * | by applicant | DE2741297 | JPH0840195 | EP0721867 | DE29510050U | DE29502192U |