EP0968924 - Method and apparatus for placing a sheet-like article around the neck of bottles placed in a crate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIBUYA KOGYO CO., LTD 58, Koh, Mamedahonmachi Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa-ken / JP | For all designated states SUNTORY LIMITED 1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8203 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states SHIBUYA KOGYO CO., LTD 58, Koh, Mamedahonmachi Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states SUNTORY LIMITED 1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8203 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamagishi, Akinori Shibuya Kogyo Co., Ltd., 58, Koh, Mamedahonmachi Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Sasaki, Eizo 5-22-20, Nanpeidai Takatsuki-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Takanobu 8-8-8, Saganakadai, Kidu-chou Souraku-gun, Kyoto / JP | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99112713.5 | 30.06.1999 | [2000/01] | Priority number, date | JP19980199629 | 30.06.1998 Original published format: JP 19962998 | JP19980199630 | 30.06.1998 Original published format: JP 19963098 | JP19980199631 | 30.06.1998 Original published format: JP 19963198 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0968924 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0968924 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65C3/18, B65C7/00 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
B65C3/18 (EP,US);
B65C7/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5333 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/37] |
Former [2000/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Anbringen eines blattförmigen Gegenstandes um den Hals von Flaschen in einem Kasten | [2000/01] | English: | Method and apparatus for placing a sheet-like article around the neck of bottles placed in a crate | [2000/01] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour placer un article en forme de feuillet autour du cou de bouteilles se trouvant dans un casier | [2000/01] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 18.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2535473 (WOLFORD WALTER L) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 6 - line 72 * [A] 3-6,8; | [XA]US3324537 (CARTER PAUL H, et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,7,11-14; claims 1,2 * [A] 3-6,8; | [A]FR2447859 (MARNIER LAPOSTOLLE PRODUITS) [A] 1,3-6,8 * figure -; claims 1-3 * |