EP1067493 - Cash insert for a cash register drawer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anker Systems GmbH Am Stadtholz 39 33609 Bielefeld / DE | [2001/27] |
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states ADS Anker GmbH Am Stadtholz 39 D-33609 Bielefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beek, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Auf dem Balkenkamp 5 32361 Preussisch Oldendorf / DE | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Schirmer, Siegfried Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Detmolderstrasse 235 33605 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Schirmer, Siegfried Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Detmolderstrasse 235 33605 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2001/02] | Schirmer, Siegfried, Dipl.-Ing. Boehmert & Boehmert, Patentanwalt, Osningstrasse 10 33605 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 99112895.0 | 03.07.1999 | [2001/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1067493 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1067493 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G07G1/00 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
G07G1/0027 (EP);
A47B2088/4274 (EP);
A47B2210/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/02] | Title | German: | Geldeinsatz für eine Kassenschublade | [2001/02] | English: | Cash insert for a cash register drawer | [2001/02] | French: | Casier à monnaie inséré pour tiroir-caisse | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 12.08.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 13.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 08.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 14.11.2001 | GR | 14.11.2001 | IE | 14.11.2001 | IT | 14.11.2001 | DK | 14.02.2002 | PT | 14.02.2002 | SE | 14.02.2002 | ES | 30.05.2002 | AT | 03.07.2002 | LU | 03.07.2002 | BE | 31.07.2002 | CY | 31.07.2002 | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/39] | FI | 14.11.2001 | |
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
IE | 14.11.2001 | ||
DK | 14.02.2002 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
AT | 03.07.2002 | ||
LU | 03.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | FI | 14.11.2001 | |
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
IE | 14.11.2001 | ||
DK | 14.02.2002 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
AT | 03.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 14.11.2001 | |
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
IE | 14.11.2001 | ||
DK | 14.02.2002 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
AT | 03.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/03] | FI | 14.11.2001 | |
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
IE | 14.11.2001 | ||
DK | 14.02.2002 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
AT | 03.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/51] | FI | 14.11.2001 | |
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
IE | 14.11.2001 | ||
DK | 14.02.2002 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 14.11.2001 | |
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
IE | 14.11.2001 | ||
DK | 14.02.2002 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 14.11.2001 | |
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
IE | 14.11.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 14.11.2001 | |
IE | 14.11.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 14.11.2001 | |
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 14.02.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2155731 (ALNO MOEBEL) [A] 1,10-12 * figure - *; | [A]EP0121710 (NIXDORF COMPUTER AG [DE]) [A] 1,4-7 * figure - *; | [X]DE3411686 (NIXDORF COMPUTER AG) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0234596 (CONTROL COMMERCE AG [CH]) [A] 10-12 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB2214412 (TENERET LTD [IE]) [A] 1,2; | [A]EP0383468 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [XA]DE9113291U (ADS ANKER GMBH) [X] 1-4,7,9 * figures 1,2,4 * [A] 5,6; | [A]DE9203191U (SIEMENS NIXDORF INFORMATIONSSYSTEME) [A] 1,10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0678255 (RIOJA CALVO MIGUEL ANGEL D [ES]) [A] 1,2,10-12 * column 12, line 31 - column 14, line 32; figures 4-6 *; | [A]DE19726838 (SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST [DE]) [A] 1,6 * figures 1,2 * |