EP0976354 - Whipped cream apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jüngel & Severin Inh. Angelika Möckl e.K. Finkenstrasse 11 82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | [2003/37] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states Jüngel & Severin Zugspitzstrasse 67 82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Möckl, Karl-Heinz Loisachauenstrasse 50 82496 Oberau / DE | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Flosdorff, Jürgen Huss, Flosdorff & Partner GbR Klarweinstrasse 39 82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Flosdorff, Jürgen, Dr. Alleestrasse 33 82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99112901.6 | 03.07.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | DE1998134066 | 29.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19834066 | [2000/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0976354 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0976354 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/12 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
A47J43/121 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [2000/42] |
Former [2000/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sahneapparat | [2000/05] | English: | Whipped cream apparatus | [2000/05] | French: | Machine pour faire de la crème fouettée | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 03.08.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE | 02.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.09.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2224689 (GIMAS SRL [IT]) [X] 1,2* page 2, line 14 - page 4, line 6; figure - *; | [X]FR2385962 (MASSARANI GIULIANO [IT]) [X] 1,2,7,9 * page 1, line 30 - page 4, line 26; figure . *; | [X]DE8804879U (PERNOVA SCHMITZ GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1,2,7,9 * page 7, line 17 - page 10, line 26; figure - * |