EP0984160 - Voltage transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mock, Randolf, Dr. Ludwig-Erhard-Allee 29 81739 München / DE | 02 /
Kappel, Andreas, Dr. Zugspitzstrasse 7 85649 Brunnthal / DE | [2000/10] | Application number, filing date | 99113093.1 | 06.07.1999 | [2000/10] | Priority number, date | DE1998134673 | 31.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19834673 | [2000/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0984160 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0984160 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | [2000/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0984160 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F02P3/12, F02P3/02 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
H10N30/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/04] |
Former [2000/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Spannungstransformator | [2000/10] | English: | Voltage transformer | [2000/10] | French: | Transformateur de tension | [2000/10] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 26.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS60190667 (NIPPON SOKEN); | [XY]DE4131553 (MASSAG CHRISTOPH [DE]); | [A]EP0748935 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) |