blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0975067

EP0975067 - Card edge connector with improved reference terminals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.08.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 16.10.2002  [2002/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court Lisle
Illinois 60532-1682 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court
Lisle Illinois 60532-1682 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Panella, Augusto P.
2569 Midland Drive
Naperville, Illinois 60564 / US
02 / Cheong, Kai Mook
1101 Iroquois Avenue, Apt. 2406
Naperville, Illinois 60563 / US
03 / Lang, Harold Keith
606 Algonquin Road
Fox River Grove, Illinois 60021 / US
04 / Triner, Irvin R.
8456 Buckingham Court
Willow Springs, Illinois 60480 / US
05 / Tung, Shyh-Lin
31-25, 5F, Tung-Choon Road
Taiping City, Taichung Hsien / TW
06 / Walse, Alan S.
445 Sunset Avenue
LaGrange, Illinois 60525 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Alexandrastraße 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte, Alexandrastrasse 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date99113380.210.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateUS1998012052722.07.1998         Original published format: US 120527
[2000/05]
Former [2000/04]US1998012052717.07.1998
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975067
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:H01R24/00, H01R12/18
[2000/04]
CPC:
H01R12/721 (EP,US); H01R12/70 (KR); H01R12/72 (KR);
H01R13/6585 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Leiterplatterandverbinder mit verbesserten Referenzklemmen[2000/04]
English:Card edge connector with improved reference terminals[2000/04]
French:Connecteur de bord de carte avec terminaux de référence améliorés[2000/04]
Examination procedure19.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
22.08.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0676833  (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,9 * abstract * * column 3, line 19 - column 5, line 3 *;
 [A]GB1170256  (PAINTON & CO LTD) [A] 1,9 * figures 1,3 * * page 2, line 90 - page 3, line 41 *;
 [A]EP0436943  (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * column 5, line 32 - column 7, line 19 *;
 [AD]EP0562427  (MOLEX INC [US]) [AD] 9 * abstract * * column 7, line 23 - line 54 *;
 [A]US5779507  (YEH TE-HSIN [TW]) [A] 9 * abstract * * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 21 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.