blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0975061

EP0975061 - A watertight connector with inertial locking mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city
Mie 510-8503 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Matsushita, Yasuo, Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510-8503 / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113450.312.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1998020832223.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20832298
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0975061
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0975061
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975061
Date:31.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:H01R13/52, H01R13/627, H01R13/62, H01R13/629, H01R13/40
[2000/15]
CPC:
H01R13/6271 (EP,US); H01R13/6273 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/04]H01R13/52
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/52]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wasserdichter Verbinder mit Trägheitsverriegelungsvorrichtung[2000/04]
English:A watertight connector with inertial locking mechanism[2000/04]
French:Connecteur étanche à l'eau avec méchanisme de verrouillage d'inertie[2000/04]
Examination procedure05.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
24.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2003Fee for grant paid
04.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT31.03.2004
[2008/16]
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5484301  (KOUMATSU SEIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * all figures; column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 14 * [Y] 6,7;
 [Y]EP0803937  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [Y] 6,7 * column 4, lines 11-30; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US5292258  (SAKURAI KAZUAKI [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.