blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971493

EP0971493 - Chromatic dispersion and nonlinearity compensation in optical fibre communication [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.05.2004  [2004/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsuda, Takashi
c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
02 / Yamane, Kazuo
c/o Fujitsu Ltd, 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211- / JP
03 / Kawasaki, Yumiko
1-6-704, Nishi Gotanda 4-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0031 / JP
04 / Okano, Satoru
c/o Fujitsu Hokkaido Ltd. 3-1 Nishi 4-chome,Kita7-
jo, Kita-ku, Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-08 / JP
[2000/16]
Former [2000/02]01 / Tsuda, Takashi
c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113578.108.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1998019253008.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19253098
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971493
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971493
Date:11.09.2002
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2002
ClassificationIPC:H04B10/18
[2000/02]
CPC:
H04B10/11 (EP,US); H04B10/2525 (EP,US); H04B2210/252 (EP,US);
H04B2210/254 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/22]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Nichtlinearitäts- und Farbenzerstreuungskompensierung in faseroptischer Übertragung[2000/02]
English:Chromatic dispersion and nonlinearity compensation in optical fibre communication[2000/02]
French:Compensation de la dispersion chromatique et des non-linearités à la communication à fibres optiques[2000/02]
Examination procedure11.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
13.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/21]
15.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5608562  (DELAVAUX JEAN-MARC P [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7,10,12,17 * column 3, line 10 - line 41; figures 3,4 * * column 4, line 48 - line 63 * [Y] 2-4,11,16;
 [Y]JPS6112138  ;
 [YA]US5162936  (TAGA HIDENORI [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 41; figures 1,3 * [A] 1,4,10,11
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860606), vol. 010, no. 158, Database accession no. (E - 409), & JP61012138 A 19860120 (NIPPON DENKI KK) [Y] 3,4,11,16 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.