EP0972962 - Sealing device for a roller contact bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKF INDUSTRIE S.P.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II No. 83 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states SKF INDUSTRIE S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II No. 83 I-10123 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vignotto, Angelo Via Montevideo no. 48 10134 Torino (TO) / IT | 02 /
Marivo, Massimo Via Roma no. 71 10060 Airasca (TO) / IT | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Lotti, Giorgio, et al c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Lotti, Giorgio, et al c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 99113659.9 | 14.07.1999 | [2000/03] | Priority number, date | IT1998TO00615 | 14.07.1998 Original published format: IT TO980615 | [2000/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0972962 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0972962 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/78, F16J15/32 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
F16C33/7883 (EP);
F16C41/007 (EP);
F16C19/184 (EP);
F16C2300/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/03] | F16C33/78 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/36] |
Former [2000/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dichtungsanordnung für ein Wälzlager | [2000/03] | English: | Sealing device for a roller contact bearing | [2000/03] | French: | Dispositif d'étanchéité pour un palier à contact de roulement | [2000/03] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/14] | 23.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.08.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.08.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0785369 (NSK LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6,11,12 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4906009 (SAITOH TAKAYUKI [JP]) [Y] 1-6,11,12 * the whole document *; | [PX]US5895052 (DRUCKTENHENGST ROLF [DE], et al) [PX] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4470605 (DEURING HANS [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US4639149 (BRAS JOHAN CHRISTIAAN MARINUS [NL], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5183269 (BLACK DAVID D [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0301731 (TIMKEN CO [US]) [A] 1-8,11,12 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0866249 (SKF IND SPA [IT]) [PA] 1,8,11,12 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2302372 (TORRINGTON CO [US]) [A] 1,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH09274051 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, & JP09274051 A 19971021 (NIPPON SEIKO KK) [A] 1,11,12 * abstract * |