EP0974815 - Clamp-on ultrasonic sensor arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress + Hauser Flowtec AG Kägenstrasse 7 4153 Reinach BL 1 / CH | [2015/38] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser Flowtec AG Kägenstrasse 7 CH-4153 Reinach BL 1 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagenmeyer, Heinerich, Dr. Heideggerstrasse 4c 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | 02 /
Schwarzenberger, Peter, Dr. Lange Feldstrasse 75 30926 Seelze / DE | 03 /
Moser, Thierry 6, rue Mühlweg Sierentz / FR | 04 /
Arx von, Marcel Allmendstrasse 26 4206 Seewen / CH | 05 /
Kamber, Walter In den Matten 6 4457 Dietgen / CH | 06 /
Lopatin, Sergej, Dr. Freiburger Strasse 321-A 79539 Lörrach / DE | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/38] | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2000/04] | Andres, Angelika PatServ-Zentrale Patentabteilung, Endress + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH, Postfach 2222 79574 Weil/Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 99113687.0 | 15.07.1999 | [2000/04] | Priority number, date | EP19980113670 | 22.07.1998 Original published format: EP 98113670 | [2000/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0974815 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0974815 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/66, G10K11/00, G01S7/521 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
G01F1/662 (EP);
G10K11/004 (EP);
G01S7/521 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2015/38] |
Former [2000/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Clamp-On-Ultraschall-Durchflussaufnehmer-Vorrichtung | [2000/04] | English: | Clamp-on ultrasonic sensor arrangement | [2000/04] | French: | Capteur ultrasonique de débit à serrage | [2000/04] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 24.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 16.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.09.2015 | DK | 16.09.2015 | ES | 16.09.2015 | FI | 16.09.2015 | MC | 16.09.2015 | NL | 16.09.2015 | SE | 16.09.2015 | GR | 17.12.2015 | PT | 18.01.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/22] | DK | 16.09.2015 | |
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | DK | 16.09.2015 | |
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
GR | 17.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0198731 (FRAMATOME SA) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0334795 (IRD MECHANALYSIS) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5131278 (BAUMOEL JOSEPH) [A] 1 * the whole document * |