EP0976581 - Clamping device for rail vehicles and corresponding fixing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schrey & Veit GmbH Zotzenheimer Strasse 42 55576 Sprendlingen / DE | [2000/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Veit, Günther Nostadtstrasse 77 55411 Bingen / DE | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Barth, Stephan Manuel ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - ASS-ONLY - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Barth, Stephan Manuel Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner Gbr, Patentanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99113692.0 | 16.07.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | DE19981032266 | 17.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19832266 | [2000/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0976581 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0976581 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0976581 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60B17/00 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
B60B17/0017 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/05] | Title | German: | Einspannvorrichtung für Schienenräder und entsprechendes Einspannverfahren | [2000/05] | English: | Clamping device for rail vehicles and corresponding fixing method | [2000/05] | French: | Dispositif de fixation pour roues ferroviaires et méthode correspondante pour fixer | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 28.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.10.2003 | FI | 29.10.2003 | GB | 29.10.2003 | IE | 29.10.2003 | DK | 29.01.2004 | GR | 29.01.2004 | SE | 29.01.2004 | ES | 09.02.2004 | PT | 29.03.2004 | LU | 16.07.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | CY | 29.10.2003 | |
FI | 29.10.2003 | ||
GB | 29.10.2003 | ||
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
ES | 09.02.2004 | ||
LU | 16.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
GB | 29.10.2003 | ||
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
ES | 09.02.2004 | ||
LU | 16.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
GB | 29.10.2003 | ||
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
ES | 09.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/45] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
GB | 29.10.2003 | ||
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 29.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3120068 (KLOECKNER WERKE AG [DE]) [DA] 1,13 * page 10, paragraph 2 * * abstract *; | [DA]DE8313568U (KLOEKNER-WERKE AG) [DA] 1,13 * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 10, paragraph 3 * * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [DA]DE3316759 (KLOECKNER WERKE AG) [DA] 1,13 * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 48 ** abstract * | by applicant | EP0047385 | DE3120068 | DE8313568U | DE3113268 | DE3243028 | DE3316759 | DE8114906U | DE4343008 | DE4337162 | DE4442779 | DE19617684 | DE19542342 | DE29807872U |