EP0974474 - Improved auxiliary flotation, propulsion and steering apparatus for multipurpose vehicles having an amphibian function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.R.I.S. S.p.A. Strada Cascina Bertola, 10 10040 Lombardore (TO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states A.R.I.S. S.p.A. Strada Cascina Bertola, 10 10040 Lombardore, Turin / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bellezza Quater, Giorgio Strada Bertola Poligono, 5 10040 Lombardore (Torino) / IT | 02 /
Bellezza Quater, Paolo Via Fatebenefratelli, 48 10077 S. Maurizio Canavese (Torino) / IT | 03 /
Bellezza Quater, Silvia Via Fatebenefratelli, 48 10077 S. Maurizio Canavese (Torino) / IT | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Spandonari & Modiano S.r.l. Corso Duca degli Abruzzi, 16 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Spandonari & Modiano S.r.l. Corso Duca degli Abruzzi, 16 10129 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2000/04] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Spandonari & Modiano S.r.l., Corso Duca degli Abruzzi, 16 10129 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 99113693.8 | 16.07.1999 | [2000/04] | Priority number, date | IT1998TO00135 | 24.07.1998 Original published format: IT TO980135 | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0974474 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0974474 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0974474 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60F3/00 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
B60F3/0007 (EP);
B60F3/0038 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] | Extension states | RO | 02.05.2001 | SI | 02.05.2001 | Title | German: | Verbesserte Zusatzauftrieb-, Antriebs- und Lenkungsvorrichtung für Mehrzweckfahrzeuge wie ein Amphibienfahrzeug | [2000/04] | English: | Improved auxiliary flotation, propulsion and steering apparatus for multipurpose vehicles having an amphibian function | [2000/04] | French: | Dispositif additionnel de flottaison, de propulsion et de direction pour véhicules multifonctionnels tels que véhicules amphibies | [2000/04] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 19.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.02.2005 | BE | 16.02.2005 | CH | 16.02.2005 | FR | 16.02.2005 | LI | 16.02.2005 | DK | 16.05.2005 | GR | 16.05.2005 | SE | 16.05.2005 | DE | 18.05.2005 | ES | 27.05.2005 | FI | 10.07.2005 | CY | 16.07.2005 | GB | 16.07.2005 | LU | 16.07.2005 | IE | 18.07.2005 | PT | 18.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/21] | AT | 16.02.2005 | |
BE | 16.02.2005 | ||
CH | 16.02.2005 | ||
FR | 16.02.2005 | ||
LI | 16.02.2005 | ||
DK | 16.05.2005 | ||
GR | 16.05.2005 | ||
SE | 16.05.2005 | ||
DE | 18.05.2005 | ||
ES | 27.05.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
CY | 16.07.2005 | ||
GB | 16.07.2005 | ||
IE | 18.07.2005 | ||
PT | 18.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/18] | AT | 16.02.2005 | |
BE | 16.02.2005 | ||
CH | 16.02.2005 | ||
FR | 16.02.2005 | ||
LI | 16.02.2005 | ||
DK | 16.05.2005 | ||
GR | 16.05.2005 | ||
SE | 16.05.2005 | ||
DE | 18.05.2005 | ||
ES | 27.05.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
GB | 16.07.2005 | ||
IE | 18.07.2005 | ||
PT | 18.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 16.02.2005 | |
BE | 16.02.2005 | ||
CH | 16.02.2005 | ||
FR | 16.02.2005 | ||
LI | 16.02.2005 | ||
DK | 16.05.2005 | ||
GR | 16.05.2005 | ||
SE | 16.05.2005 | ||
DE | 18.05.2005 | ||
ES | 27.05.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
GB | 16.07.2005 | ||
IE | 18.07.2005 | ||
PT | 18.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 16.02.2005 | |
BE | 16.02.2005 | ||
CH | 16.02.2005 | ||
FR | 16.02.2005 | ||
LI | 16.02.2005 | ||
DK | 16.05.2005 | ||
GR | 16.05.2005 | ||
SE | 16.05.2005 | ||
DE | 18.05.2005 | ||
ES | 27.05.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
IE | 18.07.2005 | ||
PT | 18.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 16.02.2005 | |
BE | 16.02.2005 | ||
CH | 16.02.2005 | ||
LI | 16.02.2005 | ||
DK | 16.05.2005 | ||
GR | 16.05.2005 | ||
SE | 16.05.2005 | ||
DE | 18.05.2005 | ||
ES | 27.05.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
IE | 18.07.2005 | ||
PT | 18.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 16.02.2005 | |
BE | 16.02.2005 | ||
CH | 16.02.2005 | ||
LI | 16.02.2005 | ||
DK | 16.05.2005 | ||
GR | 16.05.2005 | ||
SE | 16.05.2005 | ||
DE | 18.05.2005 | ||
ES | 27.05.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
IE | 18.07.2005 | ||
PT | 18.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/24] | AT | 16.02.2005 | |
BE | 16.02.2005 | ||
CH | 16.02.2005 | ||
LI | 16.02.2005 | ||
DK | 16.05.2005 | ||
GR | 16.05.2005 | ||
SE | 16.05.2005 | ||
DE | 18.05.2005 | ||
ES | 27.05.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
PT | 18.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/18] | AT | 16.02.2005 | |
BE | 16.02.2005 | ||
CH | 16.02.2005 | ||
LI | 16.02.2005 | ||
DK | 16.05.2005 | ||
GR | 16.05.2005 | ||
SE | 16.05.2005 | ||
DE | 18.05.2005 | ||
ES | 27.05.2005 | ||
PT | 18.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 16.02.2005 | |
BE | 16.02.2005 | ||
CH | 16.02.2005 | ||
LI | 16.02.2005 | ||
DK | 16.05.2005 | ||
GR | 16.05.2005 | ||
SE | 16.05.2005 | ||
ES | 27.05.2005 | ||
PT | 18.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 16.02.2005 | |
BE | 16.02.2005 | ||
CH | 16.02.2005 | ||
LI | 16.02.2005 | ||
DK | 16.05.2005 | ||
SE | 16.05.2005 | ||
ES | 27.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 16.02.2005 | |
BE | 16.02.2005 | ||
SE | 16.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | SE | 16.05.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3603278 (GEHLEN HERMANN WALTER) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US3765367 (HENDRICKSON E, et al); | [A]US4257505 (STODT ENNO); | [PY]EP0872366 (ARIS SPA [IT]) [PY] 1-5 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0970824 | by applicant | TOTO9800135U |