blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976383

EP0976383 - Process for a cosmetic care of the skin and patch for realising said process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.10.2004  [2004/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Gueret, Jean Louis H.
27 avenue Raymond Poincaré
75016 Paris / FR
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Schmit, Charlotte
L'Oréal
Service DIPI
9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/14]Schmit, Charlotte
L'Oréal, DPI, 6, rue Bertrand Sincholle
92585 Clichy Cedex / FR
Former [2000/05]Boulard, Denis
L'OREAL-DPI 6 rue Bertrand Sincholle
92585 Clichy Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date99113705.013.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateFR1998000988031.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9809880
[2000/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976383
Date:02.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976383
Date:22.10.2003
Language:FR
[2003/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:A61K7/00, A61L15/00, A61K9/70
[2000/05]
CPC:
A61Q19/007 (EP); A61K8/0208 (EP); A61K8/676 (EP);
A61Q19/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/42]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren für die kosmetische Behandlung der Haut und Patch für die Ausführund des Verfahrens[2000/05]
English:Process for a cosmetic care of the skin and patch for realising said process[2000/05]
French:Procédé de traitement cosmétique de la peau et patch pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé[2000/12]
Former [2000/05]Procede de traitement cosmetique de la peau et patch pour la mise en oeuvre du procede
Examination procedure02.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
02.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2003Fee for grant paid
19.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0190814  (E.R. SQUIBB & SONS) [X] 1-41 * the whole document *;
 [PX]US5811107  (B. GANGADHARAN ET AL.) [PX] 1 * column W *;
 [X]US5466456  (M. GLOVER) [X] 1-41 * column W *;
 [X]US3499446  (Y. TSUNEIZUMI ET AL.) [X] 1-41 * column W *;
 [X]EP0764441  (L'OREAL) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0412869  (L'OREAL) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0309309  (L'OREAL) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9842303  (UNILEVER PLC, UNILEVER N.V.) [PX] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0651984  (NITTO DENKO CORP.) [A] 1
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.