blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973327

EP0973327 - Image reading apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.06.2009
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2008/31]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shimomura, Hidekazu
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Sato, Hiroshi
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Satomura, Seiichiro
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Kurita, Mitsuru
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2007/46]
Former [2000/03]01 / Shimomura, Hidekazu
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Sato, Hiroshi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Satomura, Seiichiro
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Kurita, Mitsuru
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/03]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113717.513.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateJP1998019879014.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19879098
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973327
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0973327
Date:22.05.2002
[2002/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973327
Date:30.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.2002
ClassificationIPC:H04N1/40
[2000/03]
CPC:
H04N1/40056 (EP,US); H04N1/482 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2003/07]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bildlesevorrichtung und Verfahren[2000/03]
English:Image reading apparatus and method[2000/03]
French:Appareil et procédé de lecture d'images[2000/03]
Examination procedure09.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/49]
19.10.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.02.2008Fee for grant paid
29.02.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)06.05.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
11.06.2008Request for further processing filed
11.06.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
[2010/06]
Former [2009/12]NL30.07.2008
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0165550  (SHARP KK [JP]);
 [A]EP0215681  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1,9,17 * column A *;
 [A]US5450215  (IWAMA RYOUICHI [JP]);
 [A]EP0831639  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-3,5,9-11,13,17-19 * column A; figure -; claim - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.