EP0972973 - Control system for automatic vehicle transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ooyama, Kazuo c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Shimada, Takamichi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99113785.2 | 14.07.1999 | [2000/03] | Priority number, date | JP19980214773 | 15.07.1998 Original published format: JP 21477398 | [2000/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0972973 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0972973 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0972973 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/18 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
F16H61/662 (EP,US);
B60W2510/186 (EP,US);
F16H61/18 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19251 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2003 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20055 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/03] | F16H61/18, B60K41/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/32] |
Former [2000/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuerung für ein automatisches Fahrzeuggetriebe | [2000/03] | English: | Control system for automatic vehicle transmission | [2000/03] | French: | Système de commande de transmission automatique de véhicule | [2000/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 30.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0674334 ; | [A]US3957143 (BARTH JOHN W) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [X]US4208925 (MILLER ROBERT G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column 5, line 47 - line 61 * * column 6, line 12 - line 63 * * column 18, line 10 - line 16 * * figures 1-3,5 *; | [A]EP0411328 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0432507 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 3 * page 3, line 13 - line 25 * * page 15, line 5 - line 11 * * page 15, line 32 - line 41 * * figures 3-6,11,29 *; | [A]US5419412 (SCHWAB MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] 7,8 * column 1, line 7 - line 58 ** column 2, line 40 - line 47 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940621), vol. 018, no. 325, Database accession no. (M - 1625), & JP06074334 A 19940315 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |